Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:11:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. SAMUEL G WEINFURTNER

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAMUEL G WEINFURTNER. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON and JAMES R CLAYTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

JAMES R CLAYTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

SAMUEL G WEINFURTNER

Not Classified By Court

BOB BARRY BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

AMY L WALKER

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

05/17/2021 : NO INFORMATION FILED

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/09/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/09/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment (Def. L-Z); Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT; Description: COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY L WALKER