This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 01/03/2023 at 15:41:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. SAMANTHA M CINTRON

Case Summary

On 12/04/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAMANTHA M CINTRON. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDITH D CAMPBELL and MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JUDITH D CAMPBELL

MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

SAMANTHA M CINTRON

Port Ornage, FL 32129

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JULIE L OZBURN

Po Box 142

Daytona Beach, FL 32115

Defendant Attorney

ZACHARY WISEMAN

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

12/04/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

12/05/2022 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

12/05/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

12/06/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

12/07/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

12/09/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

12/15/2022 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NO INFORMATION FILED

12/20/2022 : NO INFORMATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-DV; Court Officer: CAMPBELL; Location: Judge Campbell Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: MILLER; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JULIE L OZBURN