This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 10/03/2022 at 11:39:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. ROBERT JAMES CLUPPER III

Case Summary

On 07/10/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBERT JAMES CLUPPER III. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILLER, JAMES R CLAYTON, CLAYTON, ROWE and NICHOLS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILLER

JAMES R CLAYTON

CLAYTON

ROWE

NICHOLS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROBERT JAMES CLUPPER III

Deltona, FL 32725

Not Classified By Court

AAA HELP BAIL BONDS UNLIMITED, INC.

205 N. Industrial Dr, Suite 5

Orange City, FL 32763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMY L WALKER

WILLIAM J. BUSCH

HEIDI M CRIMINS

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32214

Defendant Attorney

CRAIG R LYND

Attorney at KAUFMAN & LYND PLLC

200 E Robinson St Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

MOTION

09/22/2022 : MOTION

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

09/12/2022 : SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

09/12/2022 : SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

09/12/2022 : SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

09/12/2022 : SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

09/12/2022 : SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

09/12/2022 : SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/09/2022 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE

08/31/2022 : NOTICE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

08/16/2022 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

INFORMATION FILED

08/16/2022 : INFORMATION FILED

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

08/05/2022 : SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

08/05/2022 : SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

08/01/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

07/15/2022 : SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

07/15/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

07/11/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

07/10/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Trial Date/Time: 11/07/2022 08:30 AM; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. A-K); Trial Date/Time: 10/17/2022 08:30 AM; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: Pass-Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: MOTION; Description: FOR LEAVE TO SERVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR MEDICAL RECORDS OF VICTIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO; Description: JONATHAN FREEBOROUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO; Description: CHAD WEAVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO; Description: EBAN PRADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO; Description: ERICA MUZZY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO; Description: DEVIN DELUCCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO; Description: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO VERIZON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO; Description: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO L&L BAR INVESTMENTS LLC D/B/A THE FOXHEAD LOUNGE, C/O STEPHEN M. STONE, ESQ REGISTERED AGENT 725 N MAGNOLIA AVENUE ORLANDO, FL 32803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO; Description: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/OUT DEPO TO L&L BAR INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: ATTY CRAIG R LYND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: ROWE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA HELP BAIL BONDS UNLIMITED, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J. BUSCH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIDI M CRIMINS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY L WALKER