This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/22/2023 at 02:25:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. RANDI RENEE ROSE

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RANDI RENEE ROSE. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A ZAMBRANO, ZAMBRANO and MYERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RAUL A ZAMBRANO

ZAMBRANO

MYERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RANDI RENEE ROSE

Not Classified By Court

1 WAY OUT BAIL BONDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMIE M. ASSENT

ROBIN L HUTCHESON

Defendant Attorney

JASON BLIZZARD

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

01/10/2023 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

01/11/2023 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

01/11/2023 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/13/2023 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

01/13/2023 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

01/18/2023 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION FILED

01/30/2023 : INFORMATION FILED

ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

01/31/2023 : ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

02/02/2023 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

01/31/2023 : AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

01/31/2023 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/27/2023 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

03/15/2023 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

04/03/2023 : SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

04/12/2023 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

04/21/2023 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

05/10/2023 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 3; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 3; Status: Continued by Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: CASE; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 3; Status: Continued by Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: CASE; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 3; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 3; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: MYERS; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less