Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 13:46:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. MOHAMMED ABJULHADI M FALLATA

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MOHAMMED ABJULHADI M FALLATA. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH D CAMPBELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH D CAMPBELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

MOHAMMED ABJULHADI M FALLATA

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

SUSAN L BEXLEY

Defendant Attorney

JASON BLIZZARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/18/2021 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NO INFORMATION FILED

03/11/2021 : NO INFORMATION FILED

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

03/05/2021 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

03/04/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

03/03/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-L); Court Officer: CAMPBELL; Location: Judge Campbell Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CAMPBELL; Location: Judge Campbell Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED; Description: FAILURE TO HAVE MOTOR VEHICLE LIABILITY INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED; Description: A M E N D E D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED; Description: SAO TO CORRECT STATUTE FOR COUNT III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A751KLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A751KIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A751KHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUSAN L BEXLEY