This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/05/2023 at 19:20:45 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. MICHAEL ALLEN HIGGINBOTHAM

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MICHAEL ALLEN HIGGINBOTHAM. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN, BLACKBURN and MCNEILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN

BLACKBURN

MCNEILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MICHAEL ALLEN HIGGINBOTHAM

New Smyrna Bch, FL 32168

Not Classified By Court

LINDA'S BAIL BONDS

South Daytona, FL 32119

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREW F LANGENBACH

Attorney at BOOKER & ASSOCIATES P A

1019 Town Center Dr Ste 201

Orange City, FL 32763

DANIELLE FIELDS

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

01/26/2023 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/28/2023 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/28/2023 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: BLACKBURN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: MCNEILLY; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AH6QTDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AH6QTCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less