This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 01/03/2023 at 15:43:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. MATHEW J COMTE

Case Summary

On 12/04/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MATHEW J COMTE. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDITH D CAMPBELL and MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JUDITH D CAMPBELL

MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

MATHEW J COMTE

Ormond Beach, FL 32176

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUSAN L BEXLEY

Defendant Attorney

RUDDLEDGE H C SMITH

P O Box 15200

Daytona Beach, FL 32115

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

12/04/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

12/05/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NO INFORMATION FILED

12/08/2022 : NO INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

12/08/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

NOTICE

12/08/2022 : NOTICE

WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

12/08/2022 : WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CAMPBELL; Location: Judge Campbell Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE; Description: OF DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: BY ATTORNEY RUDDLEDGE H.C. SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: MILLER; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUSAN L BEXLEY