Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 14:40:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. MARK A BRITTON

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MARK A BRITTON. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEIGENBAUM, DAVID H FOXMAN, CROMARTIE and FOXMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEIGENBAUM

DAVID H FOXMAN

CROMARTIE

FOXMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MARK A BRITTON

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIDI M CRIMINS

224 S Beach St Suite 201

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

882 Pratt St

Deland, FL 32720

JASON BETHEA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

03/30/2021 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

03/27/2021 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

03/12/2021 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/10/2021 : NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

03/10/2021 : MOTION

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

03/03/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

03/02/2021 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

03/02/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-L); Trial Date/Time: 04/26/2021 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Judge D. Foxman Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: AFFID.VIOL.PRE-TRL SERV; Description: Address @ next Court date per Judge Foxman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FEIGENBAUM; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING; Description: 3/11/21 @ 8:30/DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: MOTION; Description: FOR IMPOSITION OF BOND OR MOTION FOR ROR OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REDUCTION OF BOND...NO ORDER...EMAILED JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON BETHEA