This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 08/07/2022 at 02:59:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. MARIA Y RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 06/25/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MARIA Y RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILLER, A CHRISTIAN MILLER and SANDERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDL

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILLER

A CHRISTIAN MILLER

SANDERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

MARIA Y RODRIGUEZ

Deland, FL 32724

Not Classified By Court

EUBANK BAIL BONDS

Deland, FL 32724

A-1 KIM PALMER BAIL BONDS VOLUSIA COUNTY

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

ELBA ROMAN-PACHECO

101 N Alabama Ave 4Th Floor

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant Attorneys

LEE M. STEPHENS

PUBLIC DEFENDER

882 Pratt St

Deland, FL 32720

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

06/25/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/25/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/25/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

07/13/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

07/28/2022 : DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

07/28/2022 : DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

07/28/2022 : DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

07/29/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. L-Z); Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-K); Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING; Description: SIGNED FOR IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: SANDERS; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A5H030P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A5H02ZP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A2GNE7P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELBA ROMAN-PACHECO