This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 05/08/2023 at 01:38:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. LEDARIUS DEVON HERBERT

Case Summary

On 03/10/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEDARIUS DEVON HERBERT. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BLACKBURN, ZAMBRANO and ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BLACKBURN

ZAMBRANO

ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LEDARIUS DEVON HERBERT

Not Classified By Court

MANN BAIL BONDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER WALKER

NANCY C SIMPSON

Defendant Attorney

JAMES A CROCKER

 

Court Documents

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

03/11/2023 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

03/14/2023 : ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/10/2023 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

03/14/2023 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/30/2023 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

04/07/2023 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

MOTION

04/10/2023 : MOTION

ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

04/13/2023 : ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Custody; Court Officer: BLACKBURN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: BLACKBURN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: ORIGINAL WARRANT/CAPIAS RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: MOTION; Description: TO REVOKE BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less