Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/07/2021 at 16:09:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. LAVOR ANTONIO BRINSON

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LAVOR ANTONIO BRINSON. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDRA C UPCHURCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDRA C UPCHURCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

LAVOR ANTONIO BRINSON

Not Classified By Court

EXPRESS BAIL BONDS VOLUSIA COUNTY

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHANNON K PETERS

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

03/04/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

03/04/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

03/04/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Judge Upchurch Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHANNON K PETERS