Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 13:59:48 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. LATOYA A WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LATOYA A WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID H FOXMAN and FOXMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID H FOXMAN

FOXMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

LATOYA A WILLIAMS

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

MICHELE S SIMONSEN

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114-3275

Defendant Attorney

MEGAN LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

03/17/2021 : NO INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/11/2021 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

03/05/2021 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

03/04/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

03/03/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

03/03/2021 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-DV; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Judge D. Foxman Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHELE S SIMONSEN