Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:06:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. LATANA D WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LATANA D WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON, RAUL A ZAMBRANO and ZAMBRANO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

RAUL A ZAMBRANO

ZAMBRANO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

LATANA D WILLIAMS

Not Classified By Court

#1 ACE BAIL BONDS

3798 W. Intl Speedway Blvd

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

CHRISTOPHER WALKER

220 S.Ridgewood Ave. St.250

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant Attorney

MITCHEL NOVAS

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114-3275

 

Court Documents

REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

05/13/2021 : REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

NO INFORMATION FILED

05/12/2021 : NO INFORMATION FILED

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/11/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/11/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/11/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/10/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/09/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

05/09/2021 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Bond; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Judge Zambrano Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADURISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADURIQE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADURIPE - COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADURIPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where #1 ACE BAIL BONDS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER WALKER