This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/30/2022 at 16:05:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. KIRSTIN BRANTON

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KIRSTIN BRANTON. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON and JAMES R CLAYTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

JAMES R CLAYTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

KIRSTIN BRANTON

Orange City, FL 32763

Not Classified By Court

EUBANK BAIL BONDS

Deland, FL 32724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMY L WALKER

WILLIAM J. BUSCH

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

06/29/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

06/30/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/30/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/30/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

07/05/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION FILED

07/08/2022 : INFORMATION FILED

WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

07/20/2022 : WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT FOR COSTS

07/21/2022 : ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT FOR COSTS

JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED

07/21/2022 : JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED

COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

07/21/2022 : COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 221.00; Final Amount: 221.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT FOR COSTS; Description: Instrument: 2022171033 Book: 8286 Page: 4062 View: 2022171033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment (Def. A-K); Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT; Description: SUPPLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J. BUSCH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY L WALKER