Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 13:48:03 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. KENNETH J BARBARINO

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KENNETH J BARBARINO. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CROMARTIE and DAVID A CROMARTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CROMARTIE

DAVID A CROMARTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

KENNETH J BARBARINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

VANESSA BROOKS

Defendant Attorney

BRUCE JOHNS

737 S Ridgewood Ave Ste 120

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

03/30/2021 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

03/22/2021 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/18/2021 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Custody; Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Judge Cromartie Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CAMPBELL; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: by Bruce Johns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUCE JOHNS