Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:08:09 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. KAYLA L FERGUSON

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KAYLA L FERGUSON. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON, MATTHEW M FOXMAN and FOXMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

MATTHEW M FOXMAN

FOXMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

KAYLA L FERGUSON

Not Classified By Court

A-1-J-1 BAIL BONDS

211 N. 6Th Street

Palatka, FL 32117

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

JOSEPH LEDONNE

EMILY WORDEN FRAZIER

 

Court Documents

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/09/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/09/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Bond; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Judge M. Foxman Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH LEDONNE