This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/06/2022 at 08:38:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. KACEY SUSANNA HANSEN

Case Summary

On 04/03/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KACEY SUSANNA HANSEN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JOLLEY, FOXMAN, A CHRISTIAN MILLER and MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDL

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILLER

A CHRISTIAN MILLER

FOXMAN

JOLLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KACEY SUSANNA HANSEN

Orange City, FL 32763

Not Classified By Court

BOB BARRY BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELBA ROMAN-PACHECO

101 N Alabama Ave 4Th Floor

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant Attorneys

JUDITH JENSEN

101 N. Alabama Ave

Deland, FL 32724

RACHEL MATTIE

P O Box 533069

Orlando, FL 32853

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

06/20/2022 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

06/06/2022 : SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

05/24/2022 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

INFORMATION FILED

05/11/2022 : INFORMATION FILED

NO INFORMATION FILED

05/07/2022 : NO INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

04/25/2022 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

04/10/2022 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

04/08/2022 : WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

04/06/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

04/06/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

04/06/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

04/06/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

04/07/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

04/05/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

04/04/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

04/03/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CITATION

04/03/2022 : CITATION

CITATION

04/03/2022 : CITATION

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. L-Z); Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. L-Z); Trial Date/Time: 07/25/2022 08:30 AM; Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#28); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27); Docket Type: SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. L-Z); Trial Date/Time: 06/20/2022 08:30 AM; Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docket(#25); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23); Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED; Description: COUNT 1 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: JOLLEY; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AG0IQGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AG0IQJE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AG0IQIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AF1YARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: REFUSAL TO SUBMIT BREATH, URINE, OR BLOOD TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELBA ROMAN-PACHECO