This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/25/2022 at 09:14:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. JOSEPH JUAN ESQUIBEL

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOSEPH JUAN ESQUIBEL. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CROMARTIE, DAWN NICHOLS and NICHOLS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAWN NICHOLS

CROMARTIE

NICHOLS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

JOSEPH JUAN ESQUIBEL

Deltona, FL 32725

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

LOVISA J ALEXANDER

713 W New York Ave

Deland, FL 32720

NICHOLAS KRAMPERTH

Defendant Attorney

JUSTINE P. SNOW

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

08/02/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

08/03/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

08/04/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

08/05/2022 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

08/09/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

08/17/2022 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

08/25/2022 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/19/2022 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD (Atty. A-K); Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLAS KRAMPERTH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVISA J ALEXANDER