This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 01/30/2023 at 16:13:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. JEFFERY A METZGER

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JEFFERY A METZGER. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ZAMBRANO, ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN and HEIDT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ZAMBRANO

ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN

HEIDT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JEFFERY A METZGER

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Not Classified By Court

AUDREY DOOHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER WALKER

220 S.Ridgewood Ave. St.250

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

ANDREW F LANGENBACH

Attorney at BOOKER & ASSOCIATES P A

1019 Town Center Dr Ste 201

Orange City, FL 32763

Defendant Attorney

MEGAN LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

11/28/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

11/28/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

11/29/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

12/07/2022 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

CASH BOND RECEIVED

12/07/2022 : CASH BOND RECEIVED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

12/27/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

01/09/2023 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

ESTREATURE OF BOND JUDGE CERTIFICATE

01/19/2023 : ESTREATURE OF BOND JUDGE CERTIFICATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 1000.00; Final Amount: 1000.00; Credits: -1000.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: ESTREATURE OF BOND JUDGE CERTIFICATE; Description: CASH BOND # 54875

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 1000.00; Final Amount: 1000.00; Credits: -1000.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: CASH BOND RECEIVED; Description: 54875

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: APPLICATION OF INDIGENCE - NOT INDIGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: HEIDT; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW F LANGENBACH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER WALKER