This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/22/2022 at 21:08:41 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. JAZMIN J GROTTO

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JAZMIN J GROTTO. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are A CHRISTIAN MILLER, MILLER and CLAYTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDL

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

A CHRISTIAN MILLER

MILLER

CLAYTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

JAZMIN J GROTTO

Orange City, FL 32763

Not Classified By Court

BOB BARRY BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

ELBA ROMAN-PACHECO

101 N Alabama Ave 4Th Floor

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant Attorneys

JUDITH JENSEN

101 N. Alabama Ave

Deland, FL 32724

PUBLIC DEFENDER

882 Pratt St

Deland, FL 32720

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

07/21/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

07/24/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

08/02/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

08/17/2022 : DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

08/17/2022 : DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

08/19/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

INFORMATION FILED

08/16/2022 : INFORMATION FILED

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

08/17/2022 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

08/22/2022 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

08/29/2022 : WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

09/06/2022 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

08/17/2022 : AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

09/06/2022 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/19/2022 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-K); Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-K); Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-DV; Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: DEMAND NOTICE OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELBA ROMAN-PACHECO