Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:11:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. JAMIE ROSE GENSLER

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JAMIE ROSE GENSLER. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON and JAMES R CLAYTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

JAMES R CLAYTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

JAMIE ROSE GENSLER

Not Classified By Court

MICHAEL HAJDASZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

AMY L WALKER

PATRICIA HENRY

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES D SMITH

101 N. Alabama Avenue

Deland, FL 32724

SCOTT T DECKER

3959 South Nova Rd Building B Suite 17

Port Orange, FL 32127

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. A-K); Trial Date/Time: 07/19/2021 08:30 AM; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment (Def. A-K); Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D; Description: CASH BOND DEPOSITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY - SCOTT DECKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 1500.00; Final Amount: 1500.00; Credits: -1500.00; Balance: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CASH BOND RECEIVED; Description: 53618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICIA HENRY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY L WALKER