Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:05:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. JAMES RAYMOND SHUBERT

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JAMES RAYMOND SHUBERT. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON, DENNIS CRAIG and CRAIG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

DENNIS CRAIG

CRAIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

JAMES RAYMOND SHUBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

JULIE L OZBURN

Po Box 142

Daytona Beach, FL 32115

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN HYER

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

05/18/2021 : NO INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

05/18/2021 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/10/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/09/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

05/09/2021 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Bond; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 1; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JULIE L OZBURN