Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:06:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. GEORGE ANTHONY BROWN

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GEORGE ANTHONY BROWN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON and SANDRA C UPCHURCH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

SANDRA C UPCHURCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

GEORGE ANTHONY BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

CHRISTOPHER WALKER

220 S.Ridgewood Ave. St.250

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT

224 S Beach St Ste 201

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

PUBLIC DEFENDER

882 Pratt St

Deland, FL 32720

JAMES DICKEY

224 S Beach St Ste 201

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

06/07/2021 : NO INFORMATION FILED

MOTION

05/17/2021 : MOTION

NOTICE

05/17/2021 : NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

05/17/2021 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

ORDER ALLOWING THE P.D. TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

05/11/2021 : ORDER ALLOWING THE P.D. TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

05/11/2021 : MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/10/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/09/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Custody; Court Officer: UPCHURCH; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED; Description: E-MAILED TO VCBJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: MOTION; Description: FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE; Description: OF (DEMAND FOR) DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: JAMES DICKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: ORDER ALLOWING THE P.D. TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Description: AND APPOINT REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER WALKER