This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 04/11/2022 at 15:49:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. FAITH ELIZABETH HASTREITER

Case Summary

On 03/12/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FAITH ELIZABETH HASTREITER. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON, JAMES R CLAYTON and ZAMBRANO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

JAMES R CLAYTON

ZAMBRANO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

FAITH ELIZABETH HASTREITER

Deland, FL 32720

Not Classified By Court

AAA HELP BAIL BONDS UNLIMITED, INC.

205 N. Industrial Dr, Suite 5

Orange City, FL 32763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

AMY L WALKER

Defendant Attorney

RACHEL MATTIE

P O Box 533069

Orlando, FL 32853

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/12/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

03/13/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

03/18/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/21/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

03/25/2022 : WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/28/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NO INFORMATION FILED

04/01/2022 : NO INFORMATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment (Def. A-K); Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment (Def. L-Z); Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY, DEMAND FOR CRIMINAL RECORDS AND EXCULPATORY INFORMATION - RACHEL MATTIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA HELP BAIL BONDS UNLIMITED, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY L WALKER