This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/04/2022 at 12:49:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. EVAN H ABATE

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EVAN H ABATE. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NICHOLS, DAWN NICHOLS and MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NICHOLS

DAWN NICHOLS

MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

EVAN H ABATE

Deland, FL 32720

Not Classified By Court

ALLIANCE BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

LOVISA J ALEXANDER

713 W New York Ave

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant Attorney

CARLOS VIDAL-COLLAZO

211 E Rich Avenue

Deland, FL 32724

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: CARLOS VIDAL-COLLAZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2022
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: MILLER; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVISA J ALEXANDER