This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/05/2023 at 20:31:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. EMMA CATHERINE DAVIS

Case Summary

On 01/29/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EMMA CATHERINE DAVIS. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KAREN A FOXMAN, FOXMAN and SCHUMANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KAREN A FOXMAN

FOXMAN

SCHUMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

EMMA CATHERINE DAVIS

Port Orange, FL 32128

Not Classified By Court

BOB BARRY BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER WALKER

220 S.Ridgewood Ave. St.250

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

01/29/2023 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/31/2023 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

02/03/2023 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 6; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less