This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 12/10/2022 at 17:38:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. ELIJAH M SMITH

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ELIJAH M SMITH. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FOXMAN, KAREN A FOXMAN and HEIDT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FOXMAN

KAREN A FOXMAN

HEIDT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ELIJAH M SMITH

Daytona Beach, FL 32117

Not Classified By Court

EXPRESS BAIL BONDS VOLUSIA COUNTY

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH LEDONNE

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

11/28/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

11/29/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

11/29/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

12/02/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

12/07/2022 : REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 6; Status: Case Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AH5GIME - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AH5GIOE - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: HEIDT; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AH5GIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AH5GIOE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH LEDONNE