Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:11:41 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. EDWIN J LEON

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EDWIN J LEON. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON, DAWN NICHOLS and NICHOLS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

DAWN NICHOLS

NICHOLS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

EDWIN J LEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

LOVISA J ALEXANDER

713 W New York Ave

Deland, FL 32720

EDITH E. BUSCH

Defendant Attorney

JOSHUA MOTT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

05/18/2021 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/10/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/08/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment - (A-Z); Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AEJN7HE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AEJN7IE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDITH E. BUSCH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVISA J ALEXANDER