This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/05/2023 at 00:36:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. EDILIO LORENZO GODINEZ BRAVO

Case Summary

On 01/22/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EDILIO LORENZO GODINEZ BRAVO. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN and BLACKBURN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN

BLACKBURN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

EDILIO LORENZO GODINEZ BRAVO

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Not Classified By Court

CELIA FIEJA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DANIELLE FIELDS

ANDREW F LANGENBACH

Attorney at BOOKER & ASSOCIATES P A

1019 Town Center Dr Ste 201

Orange City, FL 32763

Defendant Attorney

ASHLEY N. GILGER

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2023 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

01/22/2023 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

INTERPRETER SERVICES PROVIDED

01/24/2023 : INTERPRETER SERVICES PROVIDED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

01/25/2023 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

01/27/2023 : ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

NO INFORMATION FILED

02/02/2023 : NO INFORMATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: BLACKBURN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM; Description: by WebMail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 8000.00; Final Amount: 8000.00; Credits: -8000.00; Balance: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: CASH BOND RECEIVED; Description: 54982

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: INTERPRETER SERVICES PROVIDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less