Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 13:22:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. DONALD BYRD

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DONALD BYRD. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID H FOXMAN and FOXMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID H FOXMAN

FOXMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

DONALD BYRD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

HEIDI M CRIMINS

224 S Beach St Suite 201

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

03/16/2021 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/03/2021 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Judge D. Foxman Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIDI M CRIMINS