This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/19/2023 at 00:36:41 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. DANIEL EVAN RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DANIEL EVAN RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN, BLACKBURN and SCHUMANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN

BLACKBURN

SCHUMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DANIEL EVAN RODRIGUEZ

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER WALKER

220 S.Ridgewood Ave. St.250

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

NANCY C SIMPSON

Defendant Attorney

MEGAN LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

01/30/2023 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

01/30/2023 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

INFORMATION FILED

01/30/2023 : INFORMATION FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

01/30/2023 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

02/01/2023 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: BLACKBURN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less