Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/08/2021 at 16:28:54 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. CHRISTOPHER ALLEN ROSE

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER ALLEN ROSE. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON, MATTHEW M FOXMAN and FOXMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

MATTHEW M FOXMAN

FOXMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER ALLEN ROSE

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

SHANNON SHONTZ-PHILLIPS

Defendant Attorney

FRANK W SCOTT

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

05/25/2021 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

05/11/2021 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/10/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/09/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Bond; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Judge M. Foxman Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANK W SCOTT