Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 14:40:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. CATALINA R BRUST

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CATALINA R BRUST. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CROMARTIE and DAVID A CROMARTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CROMARTIE

DAVID A CROMARTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CATALINA R BRUST

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELE S SIMONSEN

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114-3275

Defendant Attorneys

SHAVONNE J. MCCANTS

PUBLIC DEFENDER

882 Pratt St

Deland, FL 32720

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

03/05/2021 : NO INFORMATION FILED

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

03/05/2021 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

03/03/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

03/02/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

03/02/2021 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-DV; Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Judge Cromartie Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHELE S SIMONSEN