This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/20/2023 at 00:47:09 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. CALVIN JAMES BUCKNER

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CALVIN JAMES BUCKNER. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN, BLACKBURN and DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ELIZABETH A BLACKBURN

BLACKBURN

DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CALVIN JAMES BUCKNER

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBIN L HUTCHESON

ANDREW F LANGENBACH

Attorney at BOOKER & ASSOCIATES P A

1019 Town Center Dr Ste 201

Orange City, FL 32763

Defendant Attorney

AARON D DELGADO

227 Seabreeze Blvd

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

01/25/2023 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

01/25/2023 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/27/2023 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/27/2023 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

01/27/2023 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

02/02/2023 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PART

02/02/2023 : MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PART

NOTICE

02/02/2023 : NOTICE

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/02/2023 : MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION

02/02/2023 : MOTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

02/02/2023 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/02/2023 : DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

02/03/2023 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

02/03/2023 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

INFORMATION FILED

02/03/2023 : INFORMATION FILED

STATEMENT OF SURRENDER:

02/16/2023 : STATEMENT OF SURRENDER:

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. A-K); Court Officer: BLACKBURN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: BLACKBURN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 4; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18); Docket Type: STATEMENT OF SURRENDER:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16); Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT; Description: SUPPLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: BY AARON DELGADO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: MOTION; Description: TO SUPRESS CONFESSIONS AND ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE; Description: OF DISCOVERY AND MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO THE ACCUSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: DEMPSEY; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less