This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/31/2022 at 15:58:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. BRANDON WAYNE BONNEVILLE

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BRANDON WAYNE BONNEVILLE. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILLER and A CHRISTIAN MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDL

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

A CHRISTIAN MILLER

MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BRANDON WAYNE BONNEVILLE

Deltona, FL 32725

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELBA ROMAN-PACHECO

101 N Alabama Ave 4Th Floor

Deland, FL 32724

Defendant Attorney

JUDITH JENSEN

101 N. Alabama Ave

Deland, FL 32724

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

06/30/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

07/01/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

07/05/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

07/07/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

07/07/2022 : COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

07/13/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: MILLER; Location: DeLand Courtroom 3A; Status: Pass-Need Info

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Jail Arraignment; Court Officer: CAMPBELL; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELBA ROMAN-PACHECO