This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/11/2022 at 02:35:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. AZIA LATWONYA DENTON

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against AZIA LATWONYA DENTON. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAWN NICHOLS and NICHOLS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAWN NICHOLS

NICHOLS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

AZIA LATWONYA DENTON

Deltona, FL 32738

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

NICHOLAS KRAMPERTH

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

882 Pratt St

Deland, FL 32720

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

08/04/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

08/23/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD (Atty. A-K); Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLAS KRAMPERTH