Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:07:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. ANTONIO EUGENE GOODIN

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ANTONIO EUGENE GOODIN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON, RAUL A ZAMBRANO and ZAMBRANO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

RAUL A ZAMBRANO

ZAMBRANO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

ANTONIO EUGENE GOODIN

Not Classified By Court

EXPRESS BAIL BONDS VOLUSIA COUNTY

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

JOSEPH LEDONNE

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

05/25/2021 : NO INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

05/21/2021 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/09/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/09/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/09/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Bond; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Judge Zambrano Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADF614E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH LEDONNE