This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 03:36:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. WILLIAM HAROLD HOEY

Case Summary

On 02/17/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAM HAROLD HOEY. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELLE SCHUMANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELLE SCHUMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

WILLIAM HAROLD HOEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PENDING BAR NUMBER

Defendant Attorney

SHAVONNE J. MCCANTS

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

02/17/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/05/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

03/13/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/17/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

04/06/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

06/09/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

06/25/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

07/02/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

07/21/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

07/25/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

07/26/2020 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

07/29/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

08/02/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

08/06/2020 : ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 221.00; Final Amount: 221.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED; Description: Instrument: 2020145850 Book: 7891 Page: 1979

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: ORIGINAL WARRANT/CAPIAS RECEIVED; Description: 2020215480

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less