Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/05/2020 at 00:11:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. TRACI L KOELSCH

Case Summary

On 06/22/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TRACI L KOELSCH. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAIG and DENNIS CRAIG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CRAIG

DENNIS CRAIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

TRACI L KOELSCH

Not Classified By Court

BOB BARRY BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

MARYCATHERINE K. CROCK

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL MARTINEZ

997 S Wickham Rd Suite 2

Melbourne, FL 32904

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED

07/24/2020 : JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

07/22/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF SEN. RET'D

07/23/2020 : NOTICE OF SEN. RET'D

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

07/09/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

07/02/2020 : NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

03/18/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

03/09/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

02/27/2020 : NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

01/24/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

01/06/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

12/30/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

11/12/2019 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

10/25/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/26/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

07/09/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/24/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/24/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

06/22/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Judge Craig Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 221.00; Final Amount: 221.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT FOR COSTS; Description: Instrument: 2020143431 Book: 7889 Page: 3594

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SEN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Sentencing; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 1; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Sentencing; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Bond; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 1; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AC11CIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2019
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less