Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/22/2020 at 01:07:41 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. SHERI MARIE BEENY

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SHERI MARIE BEENY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A ZAMBRANO, ZAMBRANO and MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RAUL A ZAMBRANO

ZAMBRANO

MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

SHERI MARIE BEENY

Not Classified By Court

STING RAY BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

ROBIN L HUTCHESON

ERIC LEB

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant Attorney

MATTHEW METZ

 

Court Documents

WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

02/19/2020 : WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

02/18/2020 : NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

01/03/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

SURRENDER NOTICE/REQ. TO EXONERATE/CLK. RESP.

12/02/2019 : SURRENDER NOTICE/REQ. TO EXONERATE/CLK. RESP.

STATEMENT OF SURRENDER:

11/27/2019 : STATEMENT OF SURRENDER:

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

11/26/2019 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

11/15/2019 : PRETRIAL SERVICES COURT COMMUNICATION

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

11/06/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

11/06/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

11/06/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

10/29/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/08/2019 : NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

10/04/2019 : MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

09/20/2019 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

09/10/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

09/03/2019 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

09/03/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

09/03/2019 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Docket Sounding; Trial Date/Time: 02/24/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 3; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Docket Type: SCORE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#34) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NOTICE OF DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-trial-PD; Trial Date/Time: 02/24/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 3; Status: Pass-Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • HearingSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC LEB

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBIN L HUTCHESON