Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 07/18/2020 at 00:28:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. SEAN MAURICE OWENS

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SEAN MAURICE OWENS. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELLE SCHUMANN and SCHUMANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELLE SCHUMANN

SCHUMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

SEAN MAURICE OWENS

Not Classified By Court

JONES BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

MCKENNA MUNDY

NANCY C SIMPSON

PENDING BAR NUMBER

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

07/16/2020 : ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

07/02/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

06/18/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING

05/07/2020 : NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING

ORDER

05/06/2020 : ORDER

RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

05/01/2020 : RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING

03/18/2020 : NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING

ESTREATURE OF BOND JUDGE CERTIFICATE

03/18/2020 : ESTREATURE OF BOND JUDGE CERTIFICATE

D-6 NOTICE FILED

03/18/2020 : D-6 NOTICE FILED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

02/27/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

CORRESPONDENCE SENT TO

02/13/2020 : CORRESPONDENCE SENT TO

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

01/30/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/29/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

01/28/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Courtroom 1 Sunshine Plaza; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED; Description: Instrument: 2020130149 Book: 7880 Page: 2188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Judge Schumann Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: ORIGINAL WARRANT/CAPIAS RECEIVED; Description: RECALLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF SURETY BOND ESTR. PROCEEDING; Description: X6-0406475 (SET ASIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ORDER; Description: request granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF; Description: Emailed to Div 83

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 4; Status: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CORRESPONDENCE SENT TO; Description: Def from JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A3H02TP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NANCY C SIMPSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKENNA MUNDY