This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/11/2020 at 00:40:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. SEAN BURT HANLON

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SEAN BURT HANLON. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS CRAIG, CRAIG, FEIGENBAUM and CROMARTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DENNIS CRAIG

CRAIG

FEIGENBAUM

CROMARTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

SEAN BURT HANLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBIN L HUTCHESON

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN F. SMITH

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/09/2020 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/11/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

05/19/2020 : MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/26/2020 : NOTICE OF HEARING

WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY

05/26/2020 : WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

06/04/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

06/10/2020 : SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Continued by Defense

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Judge Craig Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Judge Craig Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Custody; Court Officer: JUDGE; Location: Beach Street Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Custody; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: TEXT; Description: OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY; Description: AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT BY BRIAN SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING; Description: 5/27/20 @ 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBIN L HUTCHESON