This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 06:27:48 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. RAFAEL M ROJAS IGLESIAS

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RAFAEL M ROJAS IGLESIAS. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MATTHEW M FOXMAN, FOXMAN and FEIGENBAUM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MATTHEW M FOXMAN

FOXMAN

FEIGENBAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RAFAEL M ROJAS IGLESIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN MCDONALD

Defendant Attorney

GLENDON GEORGE GORDON JR

444 Seabreeze Blvd. Suite 210

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

 

Court Documents

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

05/09/2020 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/09/2020 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/11/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MOTION

05/14/2020 : MOTION

ORDER DENYING

05/14/2020 : ORDER DENYING

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/15/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/15/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

06/04/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

06/27/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

07/28/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

09/02/2020 : NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

09/10/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

SCORE SHEET

09/17/2020 : SCORE SHEET

PROBATION ORDER RECEIVED

09/22/2020 : PROBATION ORDER RECEIVED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Bond; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Judge M. Foxman Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Docket Type: PROBATION ORDER RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 768.00; Final Amount: 768.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 768.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 100.00; Final Amount: 100.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 100.00; Final Amount: 100.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT FOR COSTS; Description: **CORRECTED** Instrument: 2020178566 Book: 7913 Page: 4678

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 6; Status: Case Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT FOR COSTS; Description: **NOT FOR OFFICIAL USE/SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER DENYING; Description: MOTION FOR RELEASE FROM CUSTODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: MOTION; Description: FOR RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN MCDONALD