Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/13/2020 at 21:22:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. PAUL FON NOSAVANH

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PAUL FON NOSAVANH. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES R CLAYTON and CLAYTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES R CLAYTON

CLAYTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PAUL FON NOSAVANH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMY L WALKER

TARA LIBBY

WILLIAM P ARNAU

1301 Plantation Island Dr., S Suite 302B

St Augustine, FL 32080

Defendant Attorney

CAMERON Z BROWN

251 North Ridgewood Avenue

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

PROBATION ORDER RECEIVED

11/04/2020 : PROBATION ORDER RECEIVED

WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

10/29/2020 : WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

SCORE SHEET

10/29/2020 : SCORE SHEET

NOTICE OF DOCKET SOUNDING

10/14/2020 : NOTICE OF DOCKET SOUNDING

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/14/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF DOCKET SOUNDING

07/22/2020 : NOTICE OF DOCKET SOUNDING

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

03/19/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

02/17/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

02/14/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

02/13/2020 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

02/13/2020 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

02/12/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: PROBATION ORDER RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Docket Sounding; Trial Date/Time: 11/02/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 768.00; Final Amount: 768.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 768.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 100.00; Final Amount: 100.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 100.00; Final Amount: 100.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 100.00; Final Amount: 100.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT FOR COSTS; Description: Instrument: 2020209979 Book: 7934 Page: 4926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: JUDGMENT FILED; Description: Instrument: 2020209932 Book: 7934 Page: 4795

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TARA LIBBY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arnau, William Paul

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY L WALKER