Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 06/16/2020 at 06:58:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. OSCAR BARENTOS

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OSCAR BARENTOS. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID H FOXMAN and FOXMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID H FOXMAN

FOXMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

OSCAR BARENTOS

Not Classified By Court

PATRICIA HAWKINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

TARA LIBBY

ROBERT R EDELMAN

Defendant Attorney

CARLOS VIDAL-COLLAZO

211 E Rich Ave

Deland, FL 32724

 

Court Documents

ESTREATURE OF BOND JUDGE CERTIFICATE

02/03/2020 : ESTREATURE OF BOND JUDGE CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

01/16/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

12/03/2019 : RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

11/27/2019 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

11/21/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

11/12/2019 : NOTICE OF PTL OR DKS/TRL RET'D

ORDER

11/04/2019 : ORDER

RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

11/01/2019 : RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

CASH BOND RECEIVED

10/15/2019 : CASH BOND RECEIVED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

10/09/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

D-6 NOTICE FILED

09/16/2019 : D-6 NOTICE FILED

ORDER

08/16/2019 : ORDER

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

07/23/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

06/18/2019 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

06/04/2019 : ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

05/23/2019 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

05/07/2019 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

04/25/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Type: ESTREATURE OF BOND JUDGE CERTIFICATE; Description: CASH BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 6; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#33) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 6; Status: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#30) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 6; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Docket Type: RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF; Description: LETTER TO JDG D.FOXMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-L); Trial Date/Time: 06/17/2019 08:30 AM; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 6; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE; Description: JUDGE FOXMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FOXMAN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 6; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: by Attorney Carlos J Vidal-Collazo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AB3T85E

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLOS VIDAL-COLLAZO