Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/11/2020 at 11:23:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. NICHOLAS EUGENE KELLY

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NICHOLAS EUGENE KELLY. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NICHOLS and DAWN NICHOLS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NICHOLS

DAWN NICHOLS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

NICHOLAS EUGENE KELLY

Not Classified By Court

EXPRESS BAIL BONDS VOLUSIA COUNTY

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

LOVISA J ALEXANDER

713 W New York Ave

Deland, FL 32720

ANDREW LANGENBACH

TARA LIBBY

 

Court Documents

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

12/20/2019 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

INFORMATION FILED

12/17/2019 : INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

12/04/2019 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

11/22/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

11/22/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

11/22/2019 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CITATION

11/14/2019 : CITATION

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

11/12/2019 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CITATION

11/12/2019 : CITATION

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

11/12/2019 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Criminal Hearing; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Pass-Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ORIGINAL ACFFCNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ORIGINAL ACFFC3E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ORIGINAL ACFFD3E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ORIGINAL ACFFCOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACFFCNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACFFC3E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACFFD3E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ACFFCOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW LANGENBACH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TARA LIBBY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVISA J ALEXANDER