Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 11:52:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. MICHAEL LEE COCHRAN

Case Summary

On 01/11/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MICHAEL LEE COCHRAN. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDITH D CAMPBELL and ZAMBRANO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JUDITH D CAMPBELL

ZAMBRANO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

MICHAEL LEE COCHRAN

Not Classified By Court

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

DANYELLE ALSTON

Defendant Attorney

JASON BLIZZARD

 

Court Documents

WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

02/20/2020 : WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/17/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

01/22/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

01/15/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

01/15/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

01/15/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

01/12/2020 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

01/12/2020 : ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-L); Trial Date/Time: 03/23/2020 08:30 AM; Court Officer: CAMPBELL; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 5; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Arraignment-Custody; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 3; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#15) Docket Type: ORIGINAL WARRANT/CAPIAS RECEIVED; Description: 2020212021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • HearingSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CAMPBELL; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 5; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: AFFID.VIOL.PRE-TRL SERV; Description: Warrant recalled per Judge Campbell (Def. is already in custody)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#12) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • HearingSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: VICTIM'S RIGHT TO CONFIDENTIALITY FORM - MARSY'S LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANYELLE ALSTON