Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 03/02/2021 at 14:13:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. MARTIN J LOOK

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MARTIN J LOOK. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELLE SCHUMANN, SCHUMANN, FEIGENBAUM and DAVID A CROMARTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELLE SCHUMANN

SCHUMANN

FEIGENBAUM

DAVID A CROMARTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

MARTIN J LOOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

MCKENNA MUNDY

PENDING BAR NUMBER

NANCY C SIMPSON

VANESSA BROOKS

Defendant Attorney

SHAVONNE J. MCCANTS

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

02/04/2021 : ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

01/27/2021 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

01/26/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

01/25/2021 : ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

01/24/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

01/23/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

08/18/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

07/16/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

07/02/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

06/23/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

06/09/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

03/31/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/17/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/05/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

02/24/2020 : ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

02/18/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#25) Docket Type: TEXT; Description: FINGERPRINTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 221.00; Final Amount: 221.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#24) Docket Type: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED; Description: Instrument: 2021026861 Book: 7985 Page: 2316

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: FEIGENBAUM; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: ORIGINAL WARRANT/CAPIAS RECEIVED; Description: 2020215483

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 4; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 4; Status: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: DB Annex Courtroom 4; Status: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARN. RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NANCY C SIMPSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKENNA MUNDY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANESSA BROOKS