This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 11/14/2020 at 14:06:02 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. LARRICO M HINSON

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LARRICO M HINSON. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS CRAIG and CRAIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DENNIS CRAIG

CRAIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

LARRICO M HINSON

Not Classified By Court

EXPRESS BAIL BONDS VOLUSIA COUNTY

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSEPH LEDONNE

NANCY C SIMPSON

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL P. KAPIT

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/11/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/11/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/11/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

05/11/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

06/03/2020 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

06/03/2020 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

06/19/2020 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

06/25/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

INFORMATION FILED

05/29/2020 : INFORMATION FILED

COURT ACTION FORM FILED

06/18/2020 : COURT ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

07/29/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/23/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Judge Craig Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Judge Craig Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#22) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Judge Craig Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Continued by Defense w/WRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#20) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Type: NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Docket Type: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Bond; Court Officer: CRAIG; Location: Judge Craig Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADF2UZE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADF2UYE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADF2UXE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: OTHER JUDGE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NANCY C SIMPSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH LEDONNE