Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 11/15/2020 at 07:21:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. KYLE HOWARD CRANDALL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KYLE HOWARD CRANDALL. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELLE SCHUMANN and SCHUMANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELLE SCHUMANN

SCHUMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KYLE HOWARD CRANDALL

Not Classified By Court

#1 ACE BAIL BONDS

3798 W. Intl Speedway Blvd

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NANCY C SIMPSON

MICHELE S SIMONSEN

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114-3275

VANESSA BROOKS

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL H LAMBERT

428 N Halifax Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

10/28/2020 : NO INFORMATION FILED

ORDER

10/23/2020 : ORDER

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

09/21/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

ORDER GRANTING

08/27/2020 : ORDER GRANTING

MOTION

08/27/2020 : MOTION

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

07/07/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

06/16/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

03/19/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

02/24/2020 : NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

02/16/2020 : STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT W/WITNESS LIST AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCLOSURE

MOTION TO SUPPRESS

01/23/2020 : MOTION TO SUPPRESS

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/23/2020 : MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE

01/23/2020 : NOTICE

MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF EVIDENCE

01/23/2020 : MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF EVIDENCE

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

01/22/2020 : PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

01/22/2020 : ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

01/21/2020 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

01/20/2020 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-Private (Atty. A-L); Court Officer: SCHUMANN; Location: Judge Schumann Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 573.00; Final Amount: 573.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 573.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED; Description: BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docket(#40) Docket Type: TEXT; Description: NO INFORMATION...SAO WILL CORRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Docket Type: PLEA AND WAIVER SIGNED; Description: Instrument: 2020211130 Book: 7935 Page: 3754

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Docket Type: ORDER; Description: Approving Plea and Waiver and Imposing Sentence.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Docket Type: PLEA AND WAIVER RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: BY MICHAEL LAMBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL SERVICES ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: ADDRESS CHANGE/VERIFICATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER REGARDING CONTACT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where #1 ACE BAIL BONDS is a litigant

Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NANCY C SIMPSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHELE S SIMONSEN